Accounts and annual returns VICTORIA DOCK PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1097957
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 September 2024 438 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 July 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 July 2022 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 July 2022 734 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required