Financial history LEICESTERSHIRE DOWN'S SYNDROME GROUP

Charity number: 1098024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.79k £6.17k £1.08k £8.71k £3.89k
Total expenditure £9.48k £7.79k £4.90k £7.24k £6.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A