Accounts and annual returns CFS/ME ROTHERHAM GROUP

Charity Number: 1098644
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 May 2008 08 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2008 Not Required
Annual return 04 May 2007 04 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 25 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 07 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 Not Required