Accounts and annual returns THE SHERBOURNE CENTRE

Charity number: 1099475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 March 2025 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 March 2025 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 March 2025 766 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required