Financial history THE GATEWAY GARDENS TRUST

Charity number: 1100892
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £109.39k £230.33k £319.16k £465.65k £192.93k
Total expenditure £123.12k £222.10k £316.43k £432.95k £194.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A