Financial history NETHERFIELD PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £87.45k £60.11k £54.62k £71.94k £63.12k
Total expenditure £65.22k £56.75k £44.82k £64.25k £80.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.51k £465 N/A N/A