Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF SIR WILLIAM PERKINS'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101855
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 16 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 10 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window