Accounts and annual returns BARBROOK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1098196
Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Annual return 25 November 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 November 2021 25 September 2023 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 November 2020 15 March 2022 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 25 November 2019 26 April 2021 213 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 November 2019 Not Required