Financial history FRIENDS OF TREALES C OF E SCHOOL

Charity number: 1098198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.24k £5.97k £9.86k £9.22k £6.77k
Total expenditure £3.98k £3.92k £10.70k £10.27k £7.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A