Financial history ROWLEY LANE JUNIOR & NURSERY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100507
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.44k £6.42k £21.47k £18.04k £11.68k
Total expenditure £5.08k £5.76k £13.31k £14.61k £5.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A