Financial history FRIENDS OF YSGOL GYMRAEG PWLLCOCH

Charity Number: 1116019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.77k £2.28k £931 £9.91k £16.63k
Total expenditure £5.29k £5.12k £1.66k £8.49k £5.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A