Financial history LITTLE FIDGETS PRESCHOOL/PLAYGROUP & TODDLE GROUP

Charity number: 1098418
Charity reporting is overdue by 1213 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.95k £20.00k £10.00k £19.50k £24.50k
Total expenditure £14.82k £14.97k £90.05k £14.70k £23.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £19.19k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A