Financial history PECKFORTON AND BEESTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1099523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.93k £21.46k £3.60k £3.35k £15.25k
Total expenditure £13.72k £5.92k £6.81k £11.02k £12.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.37k N/A N/A £6.10k