Accounts and annual returns 25TH ANNIVERSARY FUND

Charity Number: 1098583
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2011 27 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2010 21 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2009 25 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2008 23 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2008 Not Required