Accounts and annual returns THE COMMUNITY FORUM LTD

Charity number: 1101617
Charity reporting is overdue by 340 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 340 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 340 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 March 2021 299 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required