Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF LEGH VALE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1101588
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2017 05 March 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required