Accounts and annual returns LIBRA (BIRMINGHAM)

Charity Number: 1102264
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 07 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 17 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 13 May 2008 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 27 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 03 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 13 December 2005 On Time