Accounts and annual returns PLAS MADOC COMMUNITIES FIRST
Charity Number: 1099375
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 29 April 2014 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 01 August 2013 | 2 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 29 December 2011 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window