Financial history THE MARILLIER TRUST

Charity number: 1100693
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £33.35k £25.96k £18.17k £0 £0
Total expenditure £296.49k £110.95k £665.40k £22.39k £1.91k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0