Accounts and annual returns ISIS VALLEY EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1098954
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 August 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 28 September 2019 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required