Accounts and annual returns AIDS ORPHANS
Charity number: 1099269
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 November 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2009 | 12 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2008 | 12 February 2010 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 November 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 02 November 2007 | Not submitted |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window