Accounts and annual returns RESTORING BROKEN WALLS

Charity Number: 1100364
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 10 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required