Financial history FARNHAM HEATH END SCHOOL CHARITY FUND

Charity number: 1099158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 17/06/2020 17/06/2021 17/06/2022 17/06/2023 17/06/2024
Total gross income £60 £725 £686 £725 £630
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A