Trustees SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF ENFIELD
Charity number: 1099180

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Woo | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Zineb Outabounte | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Homayounnejad | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Mellanson | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miaad Alobeidli | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Habib Ali Mohamad Alobeidli | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harmer | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Efia Harmer | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nazila Kazempour--Vojdani | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.