Accounts and annual returns COMPASS GROUP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1099934
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2009 22 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 09 August 2010 10 days late
Annual return 30 September 2008 22 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 11 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 September 2007 14 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 14 July 2008 On Time