Accounts and annual returns GET HOOKED ON FISHING CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1101901
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 05 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 05 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 07 August 2009 554 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 10 August 2008 192 days late
Annual return 31 December 2006 26 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 26 June 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 17 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 17 July 2006 On Time