Accounts and annual returns NEATH PORT TALBOT SPECIAL FRIENDS SOCIETY

Charity number: 1100043
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2022 29 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2021 27 September 2022 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 27 September 2022 422 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required