Financial history THE MARK MACKANESS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1099820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £320 £406 £90 £15 £151
Total expenditure £3.75k £3.09k £2.70k £3.14k £5.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A