Financial history BEESTON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1101310
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2011 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015
Total gross income £1.78m £1.91m £1.70m £1.47m £1.66m
Total expenditure £1.79m £1.91m £1.68m £1.40m £1.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £2.87k £7.22k £4.64k £7.43k £9.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.77m £1.90m £1.70m £1.46m £1.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £45 £87 £54 £35 £63
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £27.30k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.78m £1.91m £1.64m £1.38m £1.50m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £11.31k £6.33k £40.41k £19.57k £13.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0