Financial history EGALITE ABSOLUE

Charity number: 1101995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £3.21k £2.24k £14.42k £38.21k £25.23k
Total expenditure £4.20k £0 £13.04k £42.34k £23.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A