Accounts and annual returns ARTS COMMUNITY EXCHANGE

Charity number: 1103919
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2009 08 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 30 September 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 25 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 14 October 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 16 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 30 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 07 October 2008 342 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 29 October 2008 364 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 November 2006 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 30 November 2006 30 days late