Accounts and annual returns VALENTINE PRIMARY PTFA

Charity number: 1100301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 23 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 October 2024 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 July 2023 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 August 2022 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2022 268 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required