Financial history COOLSHADE COMMUNITY MUSICAL WORKSHOP/COOLSHADE COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1101623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.15k £13.59k £13.55k £16.31k £13.70k
Total expenditure £11.11k £9.76k £13.10k £14.10k £11.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £7.67k N/A N/A N/A