Financial history HOUSE OF GOOD HEALTH

Charity number: 1100977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £16.57k £16.36k £23.90k £34.82k £37.92k
Total expenditure £13.57k £14.92k £19.30k £18.60k £33.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A