Financial history 1ST VIRGINIA WATER SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1100646
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.48k £27.98k £31.87k £2.72k £7.52k
Total expenditure £20.55k £13.55k £7.03k £6.96k £7.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £23.67k N/A N/A