Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF BERNADETTE R.C. SCHOOL

Charity number: 1100687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 September 2023 18 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2022 18 April 2024 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2021 23 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2020 15 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 September 2019 25 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 September 2019 Not Required