Accounts and annual returns HILLSTOWN COMMUNITY ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1103405
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 18 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 12 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 09 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 04 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 15 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 30 April 2005 17 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2005 26 July 2005 On Time