Accounts and annual returns BARUGH GREEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1101468
Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 359 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 725 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 01 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 01 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 11 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 14 May 2020 On Time Download Open in new window