Financial history OPEN HOUSE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1101043
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £65.86k £114.39k £48.73k £14.47k £25.98k
Total expenditure £59.22k £111.96k £66.09k £10.61k £19.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A