Financial history BOWLERS COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity number: 1102941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £452.50k £457.49k £459.05k £525.18k £539.60k
Total expenditure £451.44k £377.73k £444.60k £468.69k £543.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £172.55k £272.13k £174.26k £211.08k £196.33k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £211.08k £180
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £1.08k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £312.86k £341.60k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £1.25k £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £196.74k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £448.25k £543.96k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £20.44k £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £22.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £20.44k £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0