Financial history FREE FOR ALL COMMUNITY RECYCLING LTD

Charity number: 1101755
Charity reporting is up to date (24 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £14.48k £21.23k £14.60k £12.70k £12.70k
Total expenditure £11.39k £7.87k £12.58k £14.45k £10.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.83k £2.60k £600 £600