Financial history SIRI GURU NANAK GURUDWARA

Charity number: 1106352
Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £53.68k £39.35k £46.69k £14.04k £81.27k
Total expenditure £54.33k £22.86k £44.67k £38.59k £31.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A