Financial history REVIVAL - WILTSHIRE RAPE AND SEXUAL ABUSE CENTRE

Charity number: 1102911
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £216.80k £374.56k £337.06k £409.81k £303.31k
Total expenditure £232.79k £335.04k £334.07k £345.92k £334.59k
Income from government contracts £68.27k £88.53k £69.37k £70.98k £36.13k
Income from government grants £140.53k £277.95k £228.68k £264.06k £251.05k