Accounts and annual returns ESSEX DISABLED PEOPLE'S ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1102596
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 12 February 2016 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 12 February 2016 12 days late
Annual return 31 March 2014 21 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 21 December 2014 On Time