Financial history CITY CARE CARDIFF

Charity number: 1101500
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009
Total gross income £24.52k £5.38k £3.81k £8.40k £14.18k
Total expenditure £8.59k £10.96k £8.28k £9.37k £12.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A