Financial history GENTLE TOUCH HEALING ASSOCIATES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1105985
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2014 30/11/2015 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018
Total gross income £9.84k £13.29k £12.02k £9.64k £4.27k
Total expenditure £12.80k £12.44k £14.34k £9.49k £8.78k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A