Financial history CENTRE FOR DATA BASED MEDICINE

Charity Number: 1104672
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £23.77k £20.99k £5.33k £24.97k £15.40k
Total expenditure £270 £278 £284 £13.92k £12.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A