Accounts and annual returns NORTHFIELD NURSERY

Charity Number: 1102329
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 04 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 04 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 12 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 12 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 03 May 2011 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 03 May 2011 92 days late
Annual return 31 March 2009 24 August 2011 570 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 27 June 2011 512 days late