Financial history ORCHARD VALE COMMUNITY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity Number: 1101582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.30k £500 £12.04k £6.79k £2.99k
Total expenditure £9.68k £0 £1.91k £4.16k £7.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A