Financial history THE CARTER CENTRE UK FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1102654
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £9.91k £67 £23 £15.89k £2.00k
Total expenditure £894 £919 £931 £1.22k £1.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A